Accounts and annual returns THE ASSOCIATION OF PARENTS, TEACHERS AND FRIENDS OF ST PAUL'S SCHOOL

Charity number: 298174
Charity reporting is up to date (16 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 16 July 2024 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 11 July 2023 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 20 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 12 July 2021 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 26 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required