CROWTHORNE COMMUNITY MINIBUS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide transport for elderly and disabled persons in Crowthorne and environs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £497 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
21 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Bracknell Forest
- Hampshire
- Surrey
- Wokingham
Governance
- 17 December 1987: Standard registration
- CROWTHORNE COMMUNITY MINI BUS PROJECT (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD SKILTON | Chair | 14 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP DAMIAN HOOD | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Mike Frost | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Skilton | Trustee | 18 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael Timothy Fitzpatrick - Nash | Trustee | 20 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Carol Baldry | Trustee | 20 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN JONES | Trustee | 15 July 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.00k | £4.40k | £47.94k | £12.82k | £16.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.50k | £3.49k | £12.44k | £19.90k | £22.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.00k | N/A | N/A | £497 | £497 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19TH NOVEMBER 1987 AS AMENDED 20 MAY 1996
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE TRANSPORT FOR THE USE OF CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS BASED WITHIN THE COMMUNITY OF CROWTHORNE AND ITS ENVIRONS, WITHPRIORITY GIVEN TO THOSE ORGANISATIONS DEALING WITH THE ELDERLY, DISABLES AND OTHER NEED PERSONS, OR TO INDIVIDUALS IN SPECIFIC NEED BY REASON OF POVERTY, SICKNESS OR HANDICAP.
Area of benefit
CROWTHORNE AND ITS ENVIRONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
53 The Brambles
CROWTHORNE
Berkshire
RG45 6EF
- Phone:
- 01344762993
- Email:
- SKILTON_RICHARD@YAHOO.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window