THE FRIENDS OF ANDREW'S CHURCH, CHEW MAGNA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising by means of concerts, talks or other public events, seeking donations and occasional sale of appropriate merchandise in order to maintain and improve the fabric, ornaments, fittings, furniture and monuments of the Church of Saint Andrew, Chew Magna, and to support the worship within that church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bath And North East Somerset
Governance
- 21 December 1987: Standard registration
No other names
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JULIAN GUY PALLISTER | Chair | 27 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Simon Paul Prescott | Trustee | 28 June 2024 |
|
|||||
RICHARD WESTROPP | Trustee | 10 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW H DAVIS | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
ARTHUR WILLIAM LANE | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev RICHARD GREATREX | Trustee | 10 August 2001 |
|
|
||||
JOHN SPENCER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.46k | £22.73k | £18.93k | £9.27k | £7.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.17k | £13.10k | £23.14k | £6.65k | £3.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30/11/1987 AS AMENDED ON 24/07/2010
Charitable objects
TO MAINTAIN THE FABRIC FITTINGS ORNAMENTS FURNITURE AND MONUMENTS OF AND IN THE CHURCH OF ST ANDREW'S CHEW MAGNA AND IN THE PRECINCTS THEROF AND TO MAINTAIN THE WORSHIP OF ST ANDREW'S CHEW MAGNA.
Area of benefit
CHEW MAGNA
Contact information
- Address:
-
WHITE GATES
NORTON LANE
CHEW MAGNA
BRISTOL
BS40 8RW
- Phone:
- 01275331724
- Email:
- julian@pallister.myzen.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window