PRIMROSE HILL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The range of services and activities offered include childrens nursery and workshops, bridge, trapeze classes, dance classes for children and adults, music session for under 4's, under 4's drop-in, yoga, life drawing, seniors yoga, Open House, evening talks, narcotics anonymous, children's ballet, members bar, community choir, councillors surgeries, lunch club. We also run a community library.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £104,967 from 3 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Camden
Governance
- 19 January 1988: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marijke Good | Chair | 28 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Marshall | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Middleton | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucilla Mary Cottrell | Trustee | 28 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nadia Crandall | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN BETTS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £346.17k | £244.18k | £301.86k | £337.23k | £375.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £274.03k | £163.60k | £227.93k | £261.78k | £297.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £99.53k | £99.52k | £89.23k | £104.97k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 February 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 February 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19TH NOVEMBER 1987 AS AMENDED 26TH JUNE 2002
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THOSE PERSONS WHO LIVE AND/OR WORK IN THE CHALK FARM WARD OF LONDON BOROUGH OF CAMDEN AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DESTINCTION OF SEX, OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS. (B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE FOR THESE INHABITANTS. (C) TO ASSOCIATE THE LOCAL AUTHORITY, APPROPRIATE VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS, AND THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA IN A COMMON EFFORT TO THESE ENDS. (D) TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE, AND TO CO-OPERATE WITH ANY LOAL STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION.
Area of benefit
CHALK FARM WARD AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 Hopkinsons Place
LONDON
NW1 8TN
- Phone:
- 02075868327
- Email:
- info@phca.cc
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window