THE GLOSA EDUCATION ORGANISATION GEO
Charity Number: 298237
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote international language called Glosa. Publish newsletter, dictionaries and study publications.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0
Fundraising
This charity does not raise funds from the public
Trading
This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.
Trustee payments
No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
Who the charity helps:
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Belgium
- France
- Germany
- India
- Italy
- Luxembourg
- Scotland
- Uganda
- United States
Governance
Registration history:
- 10 December 1987: Standard registration
- 29 June 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42 | £112 | £60 | £40 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £35 | £0 | £165 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 24 October 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 23 May 2014 | 112 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2ND DECEMBER 1987
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE LANGUAGE CALLED GLOSA.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOR DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window