Accounts and annual returns Friends Of Downsbrook

Charity Number: 298242
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 01 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Accounts not yet received
Annual return 31 August 2023 01 February 2025 216 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 02 July 2023 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 August 2022 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required