DALTON GENEALOGICAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To further knowledge of the genealogy, heraldry and family history of Daltons all over the world and to embrace all those who bear the surname Dalton in its many variants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Canada
- Ireland
- New Zealand
- Scotland
- United States
Governance
- 13 January 1988: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL NEALE DALTON | Chair |
|
||||||
PAMELA LYNAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN DALTON BSC LRIC | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.04k | £1.61k | £2.79k | £1.45k | £2.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.69k | £2.25k | £1.56k | £2.87k | £1.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 JULY 1987
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE THE PUBLIC STUDY OF FAMILY HISTORY, GENEALOGY, HERALDRY AND LOCAL HISTORY OF ALL PERSONS AT ANY TIME HAVING THE SURNAME OF DALTON, OR ANY VARIANT THEREOF, WHETHER BY BIRTH, MARRIAGE OR OTHERWISE, AND ALL ANCESTORS, OR COLLATERALS OF, OR DESCENDANTS FROM ANY SUCH PERSON. (B) TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION, SECURITY AND ACCESSIBILITY OF ARCHIVAL MATERIAL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
East Garden Cottage
South Lane
Thornton-le-Dale
PICKERING
YO18 7QU
- Phone:
- 01751477806
- Email:
- howard.dalton@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window