CORNERSTONE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's principal objective is the proclamation and furtherance of the gospel of God concerning His Son Jesus Christ our Lord and the preaching and teaching of the Christian faith.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bromley
- Kent
- Surrey
Governance
- 06 January 1988: Standard registration
- 15 June 2010: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 15 June 2010: Funds transferred to 1135090 CORNERSTONE CHRISTIAN CENTRE (BROMLEY)
- CORNERSTONE CHRISTIAN CENTRE (Working name)
- BROMLEY NORTH FREE CHURCH TRUST (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2004 | 30/09/2005 | 30/09/2006 | 30/09/2007 | 30/09/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £329.17k | £351.30k | £389.03k | £366.00k | £365.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £357.28k | £373.54k | £393.15k | £367.57k | £348.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2008 | 23 July 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2008 | 29 July 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2007 | 24 June 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2007 | 11 June 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2006 | 24 July 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2006 | 24 July 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2005 | 18 July 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2005 | 20 July 2006 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 19 MARCH 1987 AS AMENDED 7 APRIL 1992 AND 15 OCTOBER 1992
Charitable objects
THE PROCLAMATION AND FURTHERANCE OF THE GOSPEL OF GOD CONCERNING HIS SON JESUS CHRIST OUR LORD AND THE PREACHING AND TEACHING OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE SAID DOCTRINAL BASIS OF FAITH THROUGH THE WORK AND MINISTRY OF BROMLEY NORTH FREE CHURCH (NOW KNOWN AS THE CORNERSTONE TRUST) AND THUS TO RELIEVE HUMAN SUFFERING
Area of benefit
BROMLEY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window