BRITISH COLOSTOMY ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 January 1988: Standard registration
- 05 November 2008: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 05 November 2008: Funds transferred to 1113471 COLOSTOMY UK
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £298.92k | £452.05k | £99.60k | £13.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £285.92k | £394.02k | £141.68k | £13.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 31 October 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | 31 October 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 13 September 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | 06 September 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 31 October 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | 02 November 2006 | 2 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 20 September 2006 | 324 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | 21 September 2006 | 325 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24TH NOVEMBER 1987
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND SUFFERING ARISING THEREFROM BY PROVIDING THROUGHOUT GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND AND SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT A REHABILITATION ADVISORY AND AFTERCARE SERVICES FOR PATIENTS TO FACILITATE BOTH MENTAL PRACTICAL PHYSICAL AND SPIRITUAL ADJUSTMENT BY ALLAYING FEAR AND ANXIETY AND BY TEACHING SUCH PATIENTS THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS TO ADAPT THEMSELVES TO A NEW WAY OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window