Financial history BENWICK VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 298319
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £14.95k £12.37k £12.77k £4.17k £10.61k
Total expenditure £19.86k £7.86k £17.25k £9.77k £10.14k
Income from government contracts £4.59k £2.06k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.50k £10.00k £5.00k N/A £4.00k