THE BERKHAMSTED SPORTS GROUND CHARITABLE ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of Sports facilities in Berkhamsted and grants to sporting organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 03 February 1988: Standard registration
- THE BERKHAMSTED SPORTS GROUND ASSOCIATION LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALFRED PAUL FORSTER | Chair | 15 July 2019 |
|
|||||
Daniel James Prince | Trustee | 07 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Alan Clarke | Trustee | 07 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Blesovsky | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alexander James Coakley | Trustee | 08 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Jerzy Dubenski | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Fleming | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW JAMES SPARROW | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN PAUL DAVIS | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTIAN SIMON ARMOND | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|||||
JOHN GUY SHAW | Trustee | 19 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Dennis Atkins | Trustee | 06 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY JAMES BUCKLEY | Trustee | 21 October 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.64k | £1.64k | £4.12k | £4.68k | £6.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.53k | £4.46k | £15.49k | £461 | £5.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 April 2024 | 75 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | Download Open in new window | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15TH APRIL 1924 REVISED DECEMBER 1986 AND 20TH OCTOBER 1987
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF BERKHAMSTED AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE PURPOSE OF RELAXATION AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
DACORUM
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 Cross Oak Road
BERKHAMSTED
Hertfordshire
HP4 3EH
- Phone:
- 07490069479
- Email:
- andrew.j.sparrow@gmail.com
- Website:
-
bsgca.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window