FOUNDATION FOR RENEWAL AND FORA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AMONGST UGANDANS RESIDENT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
- Uganda
Governance
- 21 December 1987: Standard registration
- UGANDA WELFARE ACTION GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JUSTINE SSERWADDA BSC HONS | Chair | 18 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN LWERANGO BSC HONS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.21k | £976 | £915 | £12.90k | £4.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.02k | £673 | £823 | £11.81k | £4.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 NOVEMBER 1987 AS AMENDED 27 JUNE 2010
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AMONGST UGANDANS RESIDENT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
First Floor
Suite 2
4 Cam Road
Stratford
London
E15 2SN
- Phone:
- 020 8470 0132
- Email:
- enquiries@ffraf.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window