Accounts and annual returns THE DOWNTON MOOT PRESERVATION TRUST LIMITED

Charity Number: 298337
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 31 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 29 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 12 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 30 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 01 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required