SAFFRON WALDEN COUNTY HIGH SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SINCE 2005 THE TRUST HAS BEEN INVOLVED IN FUND-RAISING AND APPEAL ACTIVITITIES TO RAISE MONIES TO TO IMPROVE SCHOOL AMENITIES, RESOURCES AND TO IMPROVE EDUCATIONAL OPPORTUNITIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 14 January 1988: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Polly Josephine Lankester | Chair | 30 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Easthope | Trustee | 20 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Dignasse | Trustee | 20 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Alan Broadbent | Trustee | 20 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Derbyshire | Trustee | 13 October 2016 |
|
|||||
ADRIAN JOHN GERARD HUGHES WILLIAMSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARK HAYES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.51k | £21.65k | £29.06k | £18.70k | £29.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.38k | £26.68k | £13.83k | £2.72k | £9.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 March 2021 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 March 2021 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10TH DECEMBER 1987
Charitable objects
(A) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY). (B) FOSTERING MORE EXTENDED RELATIONSHOPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL. (C) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING IT.
Area of benefit
SAFFRON WALDEN
Contact information
- Address:
-
SAFFRON WALDEN COUNTY HIGH SCHOOL
AUDLEY END ROAD
SAFFRON WALDEN
CB11 4UH
- Phone:
- 01799513030
- Email:
- plankester@swchs.net
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window