Financial history THREE OWLS BIRD SANCTUARY AND RESERVE

Charity number: 298352
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £233.58k £17.91k £19.31k £47.21k £13.05k
Total expenditure £33.95k £41.37k £47.40k £30.87k £43.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A