Accounts and annual returns MOUNT HERMON CHURCH OF GOD ASSEMBLY

Charity number: 298354
Charity reporting is overdue by 555 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 189 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 189 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 555 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 555 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 11 November 2022 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 April 2021 178 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required