Financial history SOMALI WOMEN'S REFUGEE CENTRE

Charity number: 298356
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.06k £3.01k £2.58k £3.22k £3.58k
Total expenditure £1.62k £3.01k £403 £1.50k £1.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A