Financial history UNIVERSAL PRAYER GROUP MINISTRY

Charity number: 298368
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.87m £1.46m £1.58m £1.76m £1.90m
Total expenditure £1.72m £1.27m £1.41m £1.58m £1.74m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.46m £1.40m £1.38m £1.37m £1.43m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £372.94k £38.38k £171.64k £340.66k £429.79k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £28.30k £19.35k £24.04k £28.00k £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £19.57k £36.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.61m £1.23m £1.36m £948.07k £996.98k
Expenditure - Raising funds £82.30k £569 £3.59k £15.69k £20.41k
Expenditure - Governance £28.16k £34.83k £39.30k £45.91k £49.52k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £28.16k £34.83k £39.30k £614.67k £723.87k