Financial history THE CARMELITE MONASTERY WARE TRUST

Charity number: 298379
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £21.12k £12.76k £14.05k £17.99k £18.69k
Total expenditure £35.44k £15.95k £15.82k £13.87k £39.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A