EDWARD THOMAS MOWLE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 298386
Charity reporting is overdue by 1556 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

General charitable purposes.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 January 1988: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JUSTIN LLOYD MOWLE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 826 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 826 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1191 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1191 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1556 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1556 days
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
No information available
Phone:
No information available
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available