THE LINCOLNSFIELDS CENTRE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of educational facilities for day visits and residential programmes for children and adults. Provision of training / support for young people experiencing difficulties in full time education. Protection of WW2 heritage relating to charity's property.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 14 January 1988: Standard registration
- LINCOLNSFIELDS CHILDREN'S CENTRE (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRIAN LINNEGAR | Chair |
|
||||||
Linda Casey | Trustee | 30 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
OLIVER KNIGHT | Trustee | 20 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARK FINBURGH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PHIL KNIGHT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JULIAN TREVES BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £392.70k | £236.72k | £314.28k | £457.23k | £480.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £420.64k | £228.47k | £364.15k | £538.55k | £460.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £119.83k | £56.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2ND MARCH 1987
Charitable objects
A. TO PROVIDE HOLIDAYS AND RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE (MAINLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FROM WITHIN THE BOROUGH OF LAMBETH) WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES SO AS TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. B. TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE (MAINLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FROM WITHIN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF LAMBETH) THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES WHICH REFLECT POSITIVELY THE MULTI-CULTURAL SOCIETY IN WHICH THEY LIVE.
Area of benefit
LAMBETH PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY
Contact information
- Address:
-
LINCOLNSFIELD CENTRE
LINCOLN FIELD
BUSHEY
WD23 2ES
- Phone:
- 01923233841
- Email:
- info@lincolnsfields.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window