THE POULTRY CLUB OF GREAT BRITAIN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
AIMS & OBJECTIVES: THE CONSERVATION OF PURE & RARE BREEDS OF POULTRY TO ENCOURAGE, ASSIST & ADVISE DOMESTIC POULTRY KEEPERS TO PRODUCE THE RULES OF CONDUCT FOR EXHIBITORS & ORGANISERS OF POULTRY SHOWS TO ADMINISTER THE JUDGES' PANEL & THE TESTING OF NEW JUDGES THE ORGANISATION OF THE ANNUAL NATIONAL CHAMPIONSHIP SHOW PROVISION OF THE SHOW AWARD SCHEME THROUGH MEDALS, PRIZE CARDS & ROSETTES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Guernsey
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 04 May 1988: Standard registration
- THE POULTRY CLUB OF GREAT BRITAIN (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Checkley | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Linda Kathleen Law | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Karen Griffiths | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tom Davis | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Colin Booth | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Flower | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Gary Pannell | Trustee | 30 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jonathon Michael Grubb | Trustee | 14 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
ALEXANDER JAMES YOUNG | Trustee | 29 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
PAUL KERFOOT | Trustee | 17 April 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £137.24k | £42.97k | £58.86k | £36.30k | £46.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £121.72k | £33.03k | £52.04k | £55.36k | £41.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 February 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 February 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND SHOW RULES ADOPTED JUNE 1983 AS AMENDED 22 NOVEMBER 1987 AND 5 DECEMBER 2004.
Charitable objects
THE CLUB SHALL PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS IN THE KEEPING AND BREEDING OF PURE BRED POULTRY. POULTRY IS DEFINED AS LARGE FOWL, BANTAMS, DUCKS, GEESE AND TURKEYS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lloyds Bank
Bellingham
HEXHAM
Northumberland
NE48 2AZ
- Phone:
- 07947687153
- Email:
- info@poultryclub.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window