COMMUNITY MUSIC EAST LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CME's objectives are to promote, maintain, improve and advance education particularly by the improvement of public taste, appreciation and understanding of music by the conduct of classes and courses,the presentation of concerts, the performance of music and the encouragement of the Arts generally including the arts of music, singing, dance, drama, literature, sculpture and painting.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cambridgeshire
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- C M E (Working name)
- CME (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £194.45k | £159.70k | £102.68k | £56.30k | £7.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £203.72k | £164.86k | £126.50k | £34.25k | £3.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £6.00k | £3.56k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 10 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 31 May 2017 | 120 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 12 May 2017 | 101 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 29 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 29 January 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30TH OCTOBER 1987.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE MAINTAIN IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION PARTICULARLY BY THE IMPROVEMENT AND DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC TASTE APPRECIATION AND UNDERSTANDING OF MUSIC BY THE CONDUCT OF CLASSES AND COURSES THE PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS THE PERFORMANCE OF MUSIC AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS GENERALLY INCLUDING THE ARTS OF MUSIC SINGING DANCE DRAMA LITERATURE SCULPTURE AND PAINTING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window