Financial history STEPPING STONES PRE-SCHOOL LEVERINGTON

Charity number: 298420
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £81.09k £85.72k £101.21k £115.21k £74.72k
Total expenditure £90.47k £81.17k £81.16k £86.29k £96.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A