Financial history THE RENDALL CHARITY TRUST

Charity number: 298451
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £13.99k £4.02k £21.17k £6.93k £13.42k
Total expenditure £8.24k £7.24k £9.64k £1.99k £5.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A