Accounts and annual returns NOAK BRIDGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 298460
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 03 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 December 2022 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 March 2022 137 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 November 2021 394 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required