Financial history ONSLOW VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 298468
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £34.41k £21.92k £44.36k £43.50k £45.76k
Total expenditure £34.21k £21.72k £44.34k £43.47k £45.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A