ONSLOW VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Manage Onslow Village Hall. We arrange hirings, collect fees, pay expenses, and maintain the property and contents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 20 January 1988: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MIKE GADSBY | Chair | 30 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Mills | Trustee | 22 June 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.41k | £21.92k | £44.36k | £43.50k | £45.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.21k | £21.72k | £44.34k | £43.47k | £45.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED DATED 30TH DECEMBER 1986
Charitable objects
COMMUNITY HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE BOROUGH OF GUILDFORD IN THE COUNTY OF SURREY WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES CLASSES THEATRICAL PERFORMANCES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISTURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
THE BOROUGH OF GUILDFORD IN THE COUNTYOF SURREY
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 The Drive
Farnham Road
Guildford
GU2 7QF
- Phone:
- 01483566353
- Email:
- esamgem@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window