POLISH UNIVERSITY ABROAD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDING EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR TO STUDENTS OF POLISH ORIGIN, BY SUCH MEANS AS ARE CHARITABLE IN LAW.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 August 2023
Total income includes £19,822 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hammersmith And Fulham
Governance
- 12 February 1988: Standard registration
- P U N O (Working name)
- PUNO (Working name)
- POLISH UNIVERSITY IN LONDON (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prof Michael Fleming | Trustee | 05 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Prof Grazyna Jolanta Czubinska | Trustee | 26 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Waldemar Gontarski | Trustee | 16 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Maria Dowgiel | Trustee | 11 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
URSZULA LENIK | Trustee | 25 September 2013 |
|
|||||
PROFESSOR WLODZIMIERZ ANTONY CHRISTOPHER MIER-JEDRZEJOWICZ | Trustee | 26 April 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/08/2019 | 30/08/2020 | 30/08/2021 | 30/08/2022 | 30/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £78.57k | £79.13k | £60.63k | £39.15k | £63.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £93.56k | £86.63k | £52.05k | £54.90k | £62.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £19.82k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 August 2023 | 29 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2023 | 29 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 August 2022
(These accounts |
30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 August 2019 | 12 April 2021 | 286 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2019 | 12 April 2021 | 286 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 7TH JANUARY 1988 AS AMENDED AT EGM 26 JUNE 1990 as amended on 10 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR TO PERSONS OF POLISH ORIGINS IN SUCH MEANS AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE IN LAW.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED (IN PRACTICE GREATER LONDON AREA)
Contact information
- Address:
-
238-246
King Street
London
London
W6 0RF
- Phone:
- 02088469305
- Email:
- PUNO.TRUSTEES@PUNO.AC.UK
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window