Financial history THE IAN MACPHERSON CHARITABLE TRUST 1987

Charity number: 298524
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £120.83k £3.70k £3.83k £4.24k £4.37k
Total expenditure £4.20k £6.13k £8.33k £10.29k £8.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A