THE FRIENDS OF NUFFIELD PLACE

Charity number: 298552
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Nuffield Place the former home of Lord Nuffield, is now owned by the National Trust, therefore the Friends no longer have a charitable interest. The Friends are having a meeting later this year to decide our future and we will advise you of the outcome.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2014

Total income: £88
Total expenditure: £43

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 February 1988: Standard registration
  • 01 March 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014
Total gross income £2.16k £237 £907 £144 £88
Total expenditure £15.14k £411 £35 £500 £43
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2014 20 July 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2013 07 September 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not Required