CHARITY FUND OF COURT MARY ROSE NO 137 INDEPENDENT ORDER OF FORESTERS
Charity Number: 298563
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
- The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
No information available
Where the charity operates:
- Hampshire
Governance
Registration history:
- 17 February 1988: Standard registration
- 02 May 2006: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 23RD DECEMBER 1987
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE PARTICULARLY WITHIN THE COUNTY OF HAMPSHIRE INCLUDING THE RELIEF OF POVERTY DISTRESS AND SICKNESS AND ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
HAMPSHIRE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window