BOROUGH OF TWICKENHAM LOCAL HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Awaken,foster and bring together all people having an interest in the historic past of the various parts of the former Borough of Twickenham. Register and make known existing records and collections of manuscripts, etc., relating to the Borough and to extend the collection. Undertake research into the history of the Borough and to record and to make known the results .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Richmond Upon Thames
Governance
- 17 February 1988: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EDMUND HARRIS MA | Chair | 27 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
Astrid Sylvia Powell | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN MICHAEL COTTON | Trustee | 14 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary McGlashon | Trustee | 13 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
MIKE CHERRY | Trustee | 27 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
JULIA SCAPING | Trustee | 27 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN SHEAF | Trustee | 27 September 2012 |
|
|||||
KEN HOWE MA | Trustee | 27 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr CHRISTOPHER JAMES FRENCH PhD | Trustee | 14 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
Paul Duncan Barnfield | Trustee | 03 May 1971 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.25k | £3.17k | £9.71k | £3.67k | £5.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.02k | £2.64k | £5.98k | £4.99k | £4.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED MAY 1971
Charitable objects
GENERALLY TO AWAKEN AND FOSTER AN INFORMED INTEREST IN THE HISTORY OF THE VARIOUS PARTS OF THE FORMER BOROUGH OF TWICKENHAM TO BRING TOGETHER ALL PERSONS AND BODIES HAVING AN INTEREST IN THE HISTORY AND ANTIQUITIES OF THE BOROUGH; TO REGISTER AND MAKE KNOWN EXISTING RECORDS AND COLLECTIONS OF MANUSCRIPTS AND PRINTED MATERIAL, ILLUSTRATIONS ETC., RELATING TO THE BOROUGH AND TO EXTEND THE COLLECTION; TO UNDERTAKE RESEARCH INTO THE HISTORY OF THE BOROUGH AND TO RECORD AND TO MAKE KNOWN THE RESULTS; TO COLLABORATE WITH OTHER BODIES HAVING SIMILAR OBJECTIVES; TO PAY VISITS TO PLACES OF HISTORIC AND ARCHITECTURAL INTEREST.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
258 HANWORTH ROAD
HOUNSLOW
TW3 3TY
- Phone:
- 02087370371
- Email:
- paulbarnfield@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window