Trustees BRAMDEAN AND HINTON AMPNER WOMENS INSTITUTE
Charity number: 298568

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marian Bennet | Chair | 17 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Wombell | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joan Gilchrist | Trustee | 16 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sue Gerrard | Trustee | 17 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mrs Jane Rothery | Trustee | 19 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mandy Bulloch | Trustee | 20 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOANNA LUNN | Trustee | 20 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER ANNE MORRIS | Trustee | 19 May 2008 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.