Oak Farm Learning and Activities Centre

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To assist young people with disabilities to develop through a wide range of social, educational and recreational activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
19 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
- Surrey
Governance
- 20 April 1988: Standard registration
- OFLAC (Working name)
- OAK FARM LEISURE AND ACTIVITIES CLUB (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEORGE EDWARD PARKER | Chair | 09 December 2019 |
|
|||||
Sandra Bushell | Trustee | 18 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Cooper | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|||||
Trudi Reardon | Trustee | 14 June 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £89.40k | £54.14k | £76.39k | £144.81k | £155.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £87.59k | £54.44k | £62.37k | £110.29k | £126.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9TH JUNE 1987, AMENDED 11 DECEMBER 2000 as amended on 24 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE AND EDUCATE YOUNG PERSONS WITH PHYSICAL DISABILITES OR LEARNING DIFFICULTIES RESIDENT IN NORTH EAST HAMPSHIRE AND WEST SURREY AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR SUCH PERSONS IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF DEVELOPING THEIR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY BOTH AS INDIVIDUALS AND AS INDEPENDENT MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
NORTH EAST HAMPSHIRE WEST SURREY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Samuel Cody Specialist College
Ballantyne Road
Farnborough
Farnborough
Hampshire
GU14 8SS
- Phone:
- 07802595353
- Email:
- oflacgeneral@yahoo.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window