THE BREAKAWAY COMMITTEE IN AID OF HANDICAPPED CHILDREN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's objects are to aid children suffering from physical and/or mental handicap and to try to prevent such handicap occurring.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
Governance
- 03 April 1989: Standard registration
- BREAKAWAY CHARITY COMMITTEE (Working name)
- THE BREAKAWAY CHARITY COMMITTEE IN AID OF PHYSICALLY AND MENTALLY HANDICAPPD CHILDREN (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN NISSIM | Trustee | 15 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Roy Miller | Trustee | 15 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY GRANT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAULA MORRIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELAINE GRANT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GARY GOODMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.90k | £32.64k | £45.24k | £61.87k | £64.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £66.82k | £32.01k | £40.49k | £39.46k | £67.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 16 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 16 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 03 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 03 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27TH JANUARY 1988 AS AMENDED 21 MARCH 1989.
Charitable objects
TO AID CHILDREN SUFFERING FROM PHYSICAL AND/OR MENTAL HANDICAP AND TO TRY TO PREVENT SUCH HANDICAP OCCURRING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
869 HIGH ROAD
LONDON
N12 8QA
- Phone:
- 02084455500
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window