SPECIAL CARE BABY FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide and maintain medical equipment and services and to undertake research directly or indirectly essential to support the life of babies in distress at birth for the public benefit including the education, training and support services for staff and patients and others in all matters relating to the health of mothers and babies insofar as they are legally charitable
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bromley
- Croydon
- Kent
Governance
- 22 February 1988: Standard registration
- S C B U (Working name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Virra Kris Martinez | Trustee | 19 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ester Perez Molina | Trustee | 19 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Georgie Jenkins | Trustee | 09 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Ann Stokoe | Trustee | 13 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
ALAN HOWARD QUARRY | Trustee | 11 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
KAREN FULLER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DANIELA HART | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REBECCA NANCY DE VAUX | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.07k | £7.10k | £11.61k | £4.71k | £5.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.76k | £7.79k | £797 | £803 | £8.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13TH OCTOBER 1987 AMENDED ON 10 MAY 2005
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION AND PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH IN SUCH MANNER AS TO PROVIDE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AND IN SUCH MANNER AND SUBJECT TO SUCH TERMS AND CONDITIONS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION DETERMINE INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT SO AS TO LIMIT THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN MEDICAL EQUIPMENT AND SERVICES AND TO UNDERTAKE RESEARCH DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY ESSENTIAL TO SUPPORT THE LIFE OF BABIES IN DISTRESS AT BIRTH FR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT INCLUDING THE EDUCATION TRAINING AND SUPPORT SERVICES FOR STAFF AND PARENTS AND OTHER IN ALL MATTERS THE HEALTH AND CARE OF MOTHERS AND BABIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED (IN PRACTICE BROMLEY)
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 Julian Road
Orpington
BR6 6HU
- Phone:
- 01689851564
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window