THE BASW TRUST

Charity Number: 298588
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Sponsors and undertakes research. Acts as umbrella and resource body. Campaigns against injustice, inequality & poverty. Producing practice guidance for social workers to assist them in developing their skills and knowledge base.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £107

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 February 1988: Standard registration
  • 03 August 2018: Funds received from 1126023 SOCIAL PERSPECTIVES NETWORK FOR MODERN MENTAL HEAL...
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Frances Mary Fuller Trustee 02 August 2022
None on record
Dimas David Lopez Esparrell Trustee 02 August 2022
None on record
Alix Lesley Graziani Trustee 02 August 2022
None on record
George Russell Hogarth Trustee 11 July 2022
None on record
Alison Kay Brammer Trustee 29 November 2021
None on record
THE BRITISH ASSOCIATION OF SOCIAL WORKERS Trustee 12 July 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £7.98k £28.85k £5.40k £0 £0
Total expenditure £4.24k £9.67k £1.06k £413 £107
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 19 August 2024 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 27 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 19 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 15 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 15 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 28 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
B A S W
Wellesley House
37 Waterloo Street
Birmingham
B2 5PP
Phone:
01216223911