Trustees THE SIR GEOFFREY TODD TRUST

Charity Number: 298597
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr James Hugh Macalister Horne BM BCh Chair 25 April 2014
WILLIAM HEATHER WILL TRUST
Received: On time
Jonathan Keith Fife Trustee 15 November 2024
WILLIAM HEATHER WILL TRUST
Received: On time
Jonathon Richard Culley Trustee 21 April 2023
WILLIAM HEATHER WILL TRUST
Received: On time
Margaret Anne Jones Trustee 21 April 2023
WILLIAM HEATHER WILL TRUST
Received: On time
Dr Nalini Rangesh Trustee 21 April 2023
WILLIAM HEATHER WILL TRUST
Received: On time
INNER WHEEL CLUB OF MIDHURST AND PETWORTH BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time
Rosemary Richardson Trustee 25 September 2020
WILLIAM HEATHER WILL TRUST
Received: On time
Sandra Anne Evans Trustee 14 December 2018
None on record
DR ANDREW HOPKIRK Trustee 16 August 2006
WILLIAM HEATHER WILL TRUST
Received: On time