STAR OF CROYDON LODGE NO 4286 MASONIC CHARITIES ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Collect monies from members and give to masonic charity and other charities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Croydon
Governance
- 22 February 1988: Standard registration
- 09 February 2020: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 25 May 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 11 June 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2N NOVEMBER 1987
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY PURPOSE WHICH IS EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE IN LAW AND IN PARTICULAR TO DO SO BY MAKING GRANTS TO THE FOLLOWING MASONIC INSTITUTIONS WHILE THEY REMAIN ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES, NAMELY, THE GUARD CHARITY, THE MASONIC FOUNDATION FOR THE AGED AND THE SICK, THE MASONIC TRUST FOR BOYS AND GIRLS, THE SAMARITAN FUND OF THE ROYAL MASONIC HOSPITAL AND THE MARK BENEVOLENT FUND OR TO ANY OTHER MASONIC OR OTHER INSTITUTION ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE CROYDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window