SHELTER HOUSING ACTION FOR HASTINGS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charity ceased its activities 31/03/2005.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Sussex
Governance
- 12 February 1988: Standard registration
- 24 November 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- S H A H (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £156.49k | £109.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £151.47k | £131.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 25 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 30 December 2005 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 01 December 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 01 December 2004 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13TH NOVEMBER 1987, AND AMENDED BY SOLUTION PASSED 14TH JANUARY 1988.
Charitable objects
(I) TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY AND DISTRESS OF PEOPLE LIVING IN HASTINGS AND ROTHER IN EAST SUSSEX AND THEIR ENVIRONS WHO ARE SUFFERING FORM THE EFFECTS OF HOMELESSNESS OR BAD HOUSING, PARTICULARLY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A COMPREHENSIVE HOUSING AID AND ADVICE SERVICE. (II) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC ABOUT THE NEEDS OF THOSE WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM THE EFFECTS OF HOMELESSNESS OR BAD HOUSING AND ASSOCIATED ISSUES. (III) TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO THE NEEDS OF THOSE WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM THE EFFECTS OF HOMELESSNESS OR BAD HOUSING AND ASSOCIATED ISSUES AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF.
Area of benefit
HASTINGS AND ROTHER AND ENVIRONS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window