BUSY BEES PRE-SCHOOL (CHAPMANSLADE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A Pre-School which is registered to take 20 Children each day aged 2 - 5 year. to provide a happy, fun and stimulating environment to enable all the children to develop their skills at their own pace, through free choice and structured play. Provision of a Breakfast and After School club in connection with Chapmanslade Junior School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2019
Total income includes £52,003 from 1 government contract(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Somerset
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 26 February 1988: Standard registration
- 11 July 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 31 October 2011: Re-registered
- CORSLEY AND CHAPMANSLADE PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sally Evans | Chair | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Meiling | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Lynley Gerrard | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Andy Green | Trustee | 01 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT DAVIS | Trustee | 01 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.07k | £74.16k | £67.02k | £87.15k | £85.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.45k | £69.56k | £57.74k | £78.27k | £85.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £33.50k | £59.28k | £52.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 575 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 575 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 940 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 940 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1305 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1305 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 November 2022 | 754 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 November 2022 | 754 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED FEBRUARY 1983
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BELOW COMPULSORY SCHOOL AGY BY A) PROVIDING SAFE AND SATISFYING GROUP PLAY, IN WHICH PARENTS HAVE THE RIGHT TO TAKE PART B) ENCOURAGING OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES THROUGH WHICH PARENTS MAY HELP THE CHILDREN C) FURTHERING THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUPS ASSOCIATION.
Area of benefit
CORSLEY AND CHAPMANSLADE
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Leighton Park North
Westbury
BA13 3RJ
- Phone:
- 07803615311
- Website:
-
busybeespreschoolchapmanslade.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window