ODINIST FELLOWSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of the Odinist Fellowship shall be to practise, promote and propagate Odinism. By Odinism is meant the original, indigenous form of heathen, polytheistic religion and spiritual beliefs, practised by the ancestors of the English and related northern European peoples, as embodied in the Eddas and as they have found expression in the wisdom and in the historical experience of those peoples.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Guernsey
- Ireland
- Isle Of Man
- Jersey
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 24 February 1988: Standard registration
- THE ODINIC RITE (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RALPH MICHAEL HARRISON BA | Chair |
|
||||
PAUL JOHN TOMLIN | Trustee | 23 June 2024 |
|
|||
ELLIE HILL | Trustee | 20 June 2020 |
|
|||
MATTHEW IAN BOYD | Trustee | 20 June 2020 |
|
|||
DAVID HOWARD RIGDEN | Trustee | 25 June 2012 |
|
|||
ROBERT DAVID ARTHUR GRIMES | Trustee | 25 June 2012 |
|
|||
IAN STEWART BRIGGS | Trustee |
|
||||
IAN ERIC HOLT BA | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.62k | £7.43k | £8.74k | £11.50k | £12.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.54k | £2.55k | £3.55k | £4.40k | £2.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 06 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 26 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6TH JANUARY 1988 AS AMENDED 28TH FEBRUARY 1998
Charitable objects
THE CONTINUATION AND PROMOTION OF THE ORGANIC SPIRITUAL BELIEFS AND RELIGION OF THE INDIGENOUS PEOPLES OF NORTHERN EUROPE AS EMBODIED IN THE EDDAS AND AS THEY HAVE FOUND EXPRESSION IN THE WISDOM AND IN THE HISTORICAL EXPERIENCE OF THOES PEOPLES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
B.M. EDDA
LONDON
WC1N 3XX
- Phone:
- 01636 708096
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window