Financial history THE ESSEX JAMME MASJID TRUST

Charity number: 298705
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £242.51k £153.94k £281.18k £271.72k £353.23k
Total expenditure £164.81k £123.33k £277.15k £259.98k £341.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £39.31k £36.46k N/A N/A N/A