SUKYO MAHIKARI

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sukyo Mahikari is a charity that exists for the advancement of world peace and the happiness of mankind, for the worship of God, Creator of the Universe and to guide humanity in the establishment of a universal civilisation based on a synthesis of religion and science.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Oxfordshire
- Reading
- Throughout London
- Iceland
- Ireland
- Japan
- Luxembourg
- Scotland
Governance
- 08 April 1988: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN TECK CHUAN CHOO | Chair | 09 June 1996 |
|
|||||
Vui Hau Yuen | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lamia Tully | Trustee | 17 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
VIRGINIA FOX | Trustee | 10 April 2010 |
|
|
||||
Dr SIDNEY CHANG | Trustee | 11 November 1999 |
|
|
||||
SIMON BAILEY | Trustee | 01 May 1995 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £175.34k | £177.68k | £199.40k | £170.01k | £188.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £180.31k | £189.04k | £197.98k | £178.83k | £194.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 7TH FEBRUARY 1988
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHING AND PRACTICE OF SUKYO MAHIKARI.
Area of benefit
ENGLAND AND WALES AND THE REST OF THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sukyo Mahikari
20 Suffolk Road
South Norwood
London
SE25 6EG
- Phone:
- 02087717417
- Email:
- sm.trustees@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window