Governing document CROYDON CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAUX LIMITED

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 24TH NOVEMBER 1987 AS AMENDED 5TH JULY 2000 AND 22 SEPTEMBER 2003. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13 MAY 2016 as amended on 04 Dec 2024 as amended on 04 Dec 2024 as amended on 04 Dec 2024
Charitable objects
Please note that bulk consent from the Charity Commission has already been agreed (June 2022) - arranged by Citizens Advice on behalf of CAB's in the network. Objects 4. The charity’s objects (‘Objects’) are specifically: to promote any charitable purpose for the public benefit by the advancement of education, the protection and preservation of health and the relief of poverty, sickness and distress in particular, but without limitation, for the benefit of the community in the London Borough of Croydon and surrounding areas.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF CROYDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.