Accounts and annual returns PULHAM MARKET VILLAGE HALL (OTHERWISE PULHAM MARKET MEMORIAL HALL)

Charity number: 298789
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 21 January 2024 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 21 January 2024 82 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 07 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 07 November 2022 7 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required