Friends of Warden Park Primary

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PARENT AND TEACHERS ASSOCIATION TO RAISE FUNDS FOR SCHOOL AND ORGANISE SOCIAL ACTIVITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- West Sussex
Governance
- 12 August 1988: Standard registration
- HEYWORTH SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- HEYWORTH SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- HEYWORTH SCHOOL PARENT-TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- WARDEN PARK PRIMARY ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lydia Martin | Trustee | 26 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Adele Lees | Trustee | 26 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sara Hewitt | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Constable | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ratanjot Bains | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Bridger | Trustee | 28 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Brook | Trustee | 28 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Dedman | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Philippa Sanniez | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laren Doe | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Grace Downes | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Katie Back | Trustee | 06 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Emma Callcott | Trustee | 29 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Grayson | Trustee | 04 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.97k | £4.30k | £11.61k | £30.91k | £16.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.18k | £3.08k | £6.14k | £29.44k | £29.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 November 2020 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09/10/1987 AS AMENDED ON 02/11/2006 AS AMENDED ON 19/01/2012 as amended on 28 Jun 2019 as amended on 28 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 1) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHER ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL. 2) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
WARDEN PARK PRIMARY ACADEMY
NEW ENGLAND ROAD
HAYWARDS HEATH
RH16 3JS
- Phone:
- 01444451264
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window