Financial history NAILSWORTH YOUTH CLUB

Charity number: 298818
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £78.25k £85.38k £67.20k £72.86k £76.78k
Total expenditure £133.97k £61.17k £61.77k £73.54k £83.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £46.07k £46.07k
Income from government grants £4.25k £41.11k £650 £4.58k £4.26k