SUTTON MUSIC FESTIVAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organises an annual music festival
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
Total income includes £50 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sutton
Governance
- 16 March 1988: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sara Willson | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hiroko Yoshida | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Evelyn Druce | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Josephine Periam | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Gwendoline Russell | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Alan Caddick | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
LAURA DRANE | Trustee | 16 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Penneck | Trustee | 16 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
CAROLYN BURTON | Trustee | 16 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
DAVID DRANE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.88k | £3.84k | £11.91k | £15.12k | £16.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.00k | £3.51k | £10.58k | £15.00k | £17.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.32k | £50 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 09 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 04 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 13 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 06 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18TH MARCH 1986 AS AMENDED 10 APRIL 2003, AS AMENDED 22 APRIL 2004.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND IN PARTICULAR THE ARTS OF MUSIC, SPEECH AND DRAMA AND DANCE IN ALL THEIR BRANCHES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE SUTTON LB
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 South Rise
Carshalton
Carshalton
Surrey
SM5 4PD
- Phone:
- 02086424559
- Email:
- treasurer.smf@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window